Global Patent Index - EP 1095864 A1

EP 1095864 A1 2001-05-02 - Package box

Title (en)

Package box

Title (de)

Verpackungsschachtel

Title (fr)

Boîte d'emballage

Publication

EP 1095864 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119644 A

Priority

  • DE 29918802 U
  • DE 20010391 U

Abstract (en)

Box (30) produced from a foldable shaped piece of flat material, for packaging a product together with enclosure material (34), has a pocket which accommodates the enclosure material, and can be opened and shut again from outside by means of a flap (35).

Abstract (de)

Eine Verpackungsschachtel (30) ist aus einem flach liegenden, faltbaren Zuschnitt aufrichtbar und zur Verpackung eines Gegenstands mit zugehöriger Packungsbeilage (6) vorgesehen. An dem flach liegenden Zuschnitt ist eine Tasche für die Packungsbeilage (6) ausgebildet, die mit einer Aufreißperforation (19,23) zur Entnahme der Packungsbeilage (6) versehen ist. Die einzelnen Arbeitsschritte, nämlich das Aufrichten der Verpackungsschachtel, das Beifügen und Entnehmen der Packungsbeilage und das Verpacken des Gegenstands können auf einfache Weise besser miteinander verknüpft werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/42 (2006.01); B65D 5/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/4229 (2013.01); B65D 5/4237 (2013.01); B65D 5/542 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095864 A1 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI