Global Patent Index - EP 1095871 A1

EP 1095871 A1 2001-05-02 - Pump for a container comprising a resiliently deformable membrane located outside the pump chamber

Title (en)

Pump for a container comprising a resiliently deformable membrane located outside the pump chamber

Title (de)

Pumpe für Behälter mit einer ausserhalb der Pumpenkammer angeordneten, elastisch verformbaren Membrane

Title (fr)

Pompe destinée à équiper un récipient, comportant une membrane élastiquement déformable à l'extérieur de la chambre de pompage

Publication

EP 1095871 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402979 A

Priority

FR 9913346 A

Abstract (en)

Pump, includes shaft with piston blocking release of pressurized product, but releasing it on relative movement into delivery position. The moving assembly comprises a shaft (121) with internal passage (22) for removal of product. When the piston (130) blocks the outlet opening(s) (126), product is contained. When it moves relative to the shaft, it releases the outlet opening(s) for delivery. When the piston is displaced, it moves from a position of precompression to the delivery position. This takes place under the effect of product pressure in the pumping chamber (60).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une pompe (110) destinée à équiper un récipient (R), comportant un corps de pompe (11) et un ensemble (120) mobile relativement à ce corps, comprenant un piston (130) s'appliquant de manière étanche sur le corps et définissant avec ce dernier une chambre de pompage (60) de volume variable. La pompe (110) comporte également à l'extérieur de la chambre de pompage une membrane élastiquement déformable (50) agencée pour rappeler l'ensemble mobile dans sa position initiale après la distribution d'une dose de produit. L'ensemble mobile comporte une tige (121) présentant un passage intérieur (22) pour l'évacuation du produit contenu dans la chambre de pompage, ce passage intérieur débouchant par au moins un orifice de sortie (126) dans cette dernière et la pompe comporte un piston (130) mobile par rapport à la tige (121) entre une position de pré-compression dans laquelle il obture le ou les orifices de sortie (126) et une position de distribution dans laquelle il libère le ou lesdits orifices, le déplacement du piston de sa position de pré-compression à sa position de distribution s'effectuant sous l'effet de la pression du produit dans la chambre de pompage (60). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/34; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 23/00 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01); F04B 9/14 (2006.01); F04B 23/02 (2006.01); F04B 53/00 (2006.01); F04B 53/06 (2006.01); F04B 53/12 (2006.01); F04B 53/14 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3026 (2013.01); B05B 11/0044 (2018.08); B05B 11/3025 (2013.01); B05B 11/3074 (2013.01); B05B 11/3076 (2013.01); B05B 11/3077 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2708314 A1 19950203 - CONCEPTAIR ANSTALT [LI]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095871 A1 20010502; EP 1095871 B1 20050209; AT 288857 T 20050215; CA 2324489 A1 20010426; CA 2324489 C 20040914; DE 60018009 D1 20050317; DE 60018009 T2 20060330; ES 2235802 T3 20050716; FR 2800132 A1 20010427; FR 2800132 B1 20020308; JP 2001193665 A 20010717; JP 2004286034 A 20041014; US 2002043540 A1 20020418; US 6390338 B1 20020521; US 6619513 B2 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141026

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131026

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60018009

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131026

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: L'OREAL

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-09-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235802 T3

2005-05-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60018009 P 20050317

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI