Global Patent Index - EP 1095877 A1

EP 1095877 A1 2001-05-02 - Locking device for side-by-side arranged lifting carriers

Title (en)

Locking device for side-by-side arranged lifting carriers

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung für nebeneinander angeordnete Hubwagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour chariots de levage disposés côte à côte

Publication

EP 1095877 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121172 A

Priority

DE 19952483 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19952483C1] The locking device (18) has a relatively displaced locking element mounted on one lifting and tipping device (12), cooperating with a locking plate provided by the other lifting and tipping device (15). The operation of the locking element is effected via the pivot arm (6) of one lifting and tipping device, using a coupling device (30) of adjustable length, which can be secured in 2 positions.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Verriegelungsvorrichtung (18) für nebeneinander angeordnete Hubwagen (12,15) von Hubkipp- oder Kippvorrichtungen beschrieben. Um die Verriegelungsvorrichtung (18) betätigen zu können, wobei die Hubwagen sowohl bei Benutzung der Schwenkarme (6) als auch bei Benutzung der Kammaufnahme (16) verriegelbar sein sollen, ist das Verriegelungselement (1) zu seiner Betätigung über eine längenveränderliche, in zwei Stellungen a,b fixierbare Verbindungseinrichtung (30) mit dem Schwenkarm (6) des ersten Hubwagens (12 oder 15) verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/04 (2006.01); B65F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/04 (2013.01); B65F 2003/0253 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3123191 A1 19820325 - GLOVER WEBB LIVERSIDGE LTD [GB]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19952483 C1 20010222; AT 256055 T 20031215; CZ 20003748 A3 20010613; CZ 291303 B6 20030115; DK 1095877 T3 20040105; EP 1095877 A1 20010502; EP 1095877 B1 20031210; ES 2212763 T3 20040801; HU 0004074 A2 20020128; HU 0004074 A3 20050128; HU 0004074 D0 20001228; HU 225097 B1 20060628; PL 196165 B1 20071231; PL 343453 A1 20010507; PT 1095877 E 20040430; SK 15202000 A3 20010510; SK 284656 B6 20050804; TR 200003114 A2 20010821; TR 200003114 A3 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180924

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171003

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212763 T3

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004710 P 20040122

2004-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-05 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI