Global Patent Index - EP 1095892 A2

EP 1095892 A2 2001-05-02 - Apparatus and method for winding a sheet of tapes or threads

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for winding a sheet of tapes or threads

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Aufwickeln einer Schar von Bändern oder Fäden

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour bobiner une nappe de fils ou de rubans

Publication

EP 1095892 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122334 A

Priority

DE 19951692 A

Abstract (en)

The winding device has a number of reels (16) positioned at respective winding stations (15), positioned next to one another along one longitudinal side of the winding machine, with a thread guide rail (12) in front of the winding stations, positioned in a distribution plane transverse to the longitudinal side, above the winding stations. The thread guide rail is displaced out of the distribution plane, to allow access for changing a reel via a reel changing device. Also included are Independent claims for the following: (a) a foil band or thread winding method; (b) a reel changing method for winding foil bands or threads

Abstract (de)

Es sind eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zum Aufwickeln einer Schar von Bändchen (7) oder Fäden zu einer Vielzahl von Spulen (16) beschrieben. Hierbei ist an einer Maschinenlängsseite eine Vielzahl von Wickelstellen nebeneinander angeordnet, wobei in jeder Wickelstelle zumindest eine Spule gewickelt wird. Zur Verteilung der Bänder (7) der Bändchenschar sind eine Fadenführerleiste (24) sowie mehrere jeweils den Wickelstellen zugeordnete Fadenführer (13) vorgesehen. Dabei wird die Bändchenschar (7) in einer sich quer zur Maschinenlängsseite erstreckenden Ebene (Verteilerebene) oberhalb der Wickelstellen geführt. Erfindungsgemäß ist die Fadenführerleiste (24) beweglich ausgebildet, um zum Wechsel der Spulen eine die Verteilerebene durchdringende und sich parallel zu der Maschinenlängsseite (18) erstreckende Doffebene freizugeben, damit zum Abnehmen der Spulen ein Hilfsmittel in der Doffebene führbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/20; B65H 57/00; B65H 67/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/20 (2006.01); B65H 57/00 (2006.01); B65H 57/16 (2006.01); B65H 57/26 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/20 (2013.01); B65H 57/00 (2013.01); B65H 57/16 (2013.01); B65H 57/26 (2013.01); B65H 67/0405 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01); B65H 2701/37 (2013.01); B65H 2701/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095892 A2 20010502; EP 1095892 A3 20020724; US 6439498 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030125

2003-05-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI