Global Patent Index - EP 1095895 A2

EP 1095895 A2 2001-05-02 - Guiding system for sliding doors especially elevator doors

Title (en)

Guiding system for sliding doors especially elevator doors

Title (de)

Führungsanordnung für Schiebetüren, insbesondere Aufzugstüren

Title (fr)

Système de guidage pour portes coulissantes, en particulier pour portes d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1095895 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121177 A

Priority

DE 19947515 A

Abstract (en)

The door opening is defined by a floor, vertical walls and a top. At least one guide-part (22,24) is positioned on at least one door-leaf (10,12). A fixed counter-guide (18,20) is located beneath the top edge of a threshold (34,36), and has a guide groove (26,28) open towards the lift-shaft. The counter-guide is formed in a transition part above the guide groove and acts as a deflector.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Führungsanordnung zum Führen des unteren Teils einer mindestens ein horizontal verschiebbares Türblatt (10, 12) aufweisenden Schiebetür (10, 12) zum Öffnen und Schließen einer Türöffnung, die durch einen Fußbodenbereich, senkrechte Wandbereiche und einen oberen Abschluß begrenzt ist. Die Führungsanordnung umfaßt mindestens ein an einem Türblatt (10, 12) vorgesehenes Führungsteil (22, 24) und eine diesem unterhalb einer Schwellenoberkante (34, 36) zugeordnete ortsfeste Gegenführung (18, 20) mit einer zum Schacht hin offenen Führungsnut (26, 28), wobei die Gegenführung (18, 20) in einem Übergangsbereich oberhalb der Führungsnut (26, 28) als Abweisschräge (38, 40) ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/301 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095895 A2 20010502; EP 1095895 A3 20020612; EP 1095895 B1 20040714; AT 271013 T 20040715; ES 2222874 T3 20050216

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160929

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160929

2017-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160929

2017-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 271013 T

- Effective date: 20160929

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007053

- Representative's name: KUDLEK & GRUNERT PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222874 T3

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007053 P 20040819

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLICKLE, GUENTHER

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDREAS, FRANK

2004-07-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: V.SCHOLLEY, HANS FERDINAND, FRHR

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP AUFZUGSWERKE GMBH

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLICKLE, GUENTHER

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDREAS, FRANK

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: V.SCHOLLEY, HANS FERDINAND, FRHR

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI