Global Patent Index - EP 1095900 A1

EP 1095900 A1 2001-05-02 - Fluid connector with check-valve

Title (en)

Fluid connector with check-valve

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitskupplung mit Rückschlagventil

Title (fr)

Connecteur avec clapet anti-retour

Publication

EP 1095900 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00309557 A

Priority

GB 9925778 A

Abstract (en)

A connecting device (10) is disclosed for use in connecting a container to a fluid delivery line. The connecting device (10) comprises a main body (11) defining a fluid pathway (24), and a valve arrangement (19) in the pathway. The valve arrangement (19) comprises resilient urging means (20) and a valve member (22) movable between a closed condition and an open condition. The resilient urging means (20) urges the valve member (22) to the closed condition. The valve member (22) and the resilient urging means (20) are provided as a one piece unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/08 (2006.01); B67D 7/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/0294 (2013.01); B67D 1/0831 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095900 A1 20010502; GB 9925778 D0 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070524

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061113

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOARE, ANTHONY ROBERT.C/O DAVID S. SMITH PACKAGING

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI