Global Patent Index - EP 1095997 A2

EP 1095997 A2 2001-05-02 - Phosphor for vacuum ultraviolet excitation material

Title (en)

Phosphor for vacuum ultraviolet excitation material

Title (de)

Phosphor für Vakuum-ultraviolett angeregtes Material

Title (fr)

Matériau luminescent à excitation par ultraviolets sous vide

Publication

EP 1095997 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122388 A

Priority

  • JP 30535399 A
  • JP 30535499 A
  • JP 30535599 A
  • JP 30535699 A
  • JP 30535799 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a phosphor for a vacuum ultraviolet (VUV) excitation material, obtainable by adding Eu or Tb to a compound comprising Gd, Al and O. The present invention also provides a phosphor for a vacuum ultraviolet excitation material, obtainable by adding Eu or Tb to a compound comprising Gd, Al, B and O. The present invention further provides a phosphor for a vacuum ultraviolet excitation material, obtainable by adding Eu to a compound comprising Gd, M, B and O, wherein M represents one or more alkaline earth metal elements selected from the group consisting of Ca, Sr and Ba.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 11/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/78 (2006.01); C09K 11/77 (2006.01); C09K 11/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/7774 (2013.01); C09K 11/7792 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095997 A2 20010502; EP 1095997 A3 20021120; EP 1095997 B1 20120425; KR 100757720 B1 20070911; KR 20010051205 A 20010625; TW 526260 B 20030401; US 6676853 B1 20040113

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-05-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60047120

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-05-23 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60047120

- Effective date: 20130128

2013-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130128

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60047120

- Effective date: 20120621

2012-05-30 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2012-04-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030507

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI