Global Patent Index - EP 1096028 A2

EP 1096028 A2 2001-05-02 - High-strength aluminum alloy for pressure casting and cast aluminum alloy comprising the same

Title (en)

High-strength aluminum alloy for pressure casting and cast aluminum alloy comprising the same

Title (de)

Hochfeste Aluminium-Legierung zum Druckgiessen und daraus gegossene Aluminium-Legierung

Title (fr)

Alliage d'aluminium à haute résistance mécanique pour moulages sous pression et alliage d'aluminium ainsi fondu

Publication

EP 1096028 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309071 A

Priority

JP 29957899 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a high-strength cast aluminum alloy obtained by: casting a high-strength aluminum alloy containing 3.5-4.3 % of Cu, 5.0-7.5 % of Si, 0.10-0.25 % of Mg, not more than 0.2 % of Fe, not more than 0.0003 % of P, and the balance comprising Al and unavoidable impurities; and subjecting the alloy thus cast to a T6 treatment. This cast alloy has finer eutectic Si grains by virtue of such a very low P content, enjoys casting and economic merits that are competitive with existing alloys, and satisfies higher mechanical requirements as to tensile strength, elongation, 0.2% proof strength and impact value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096028 A2 20010502; EP 1096028 A3 20020206; EP 1347066 A2 20030924; EP 1371741 A2 20031217; JP 2001123239 A 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021125

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI