Global Patent Index - EP 1096046 A3

EP 1096046 A3 2001-05-23 - Method for cleaning the yarn brakes of a creel and trolley equipped with blowing nozzles

Title (en)

Method for cleaning the yarn brakes of a creel and trolley equipped with blowing nozzles

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reinigen von Fadenbremsen eines Gatters und Düsenblaswagen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour nettoyer les freins de fil d'un cantre et chariot équipé de buses soufflantes

Publication

EP 1096046 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107624 A

Priority

DE 19924690 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19924690A1] To clean the yarn brakes at a creel, a jet blower trolley is moved and stopped in front of each vertical row of yarn brakes (10). A small vol. of compressed air is directed at each level at the yarn brakes (10), within a given blowing time, through one or more jets (25) with narrow jet openings. As the jet trolley is stopped, the jets are moved out of the transport position into the working setting before the blowing time. At the end of the blowing time, the jets are returned to the transport position. The positions of the jets (25) are set by compressed air and, during the blowing time, the compressed air is directed by the jets (25) at the yarn brakes (10). The jet trolley is stopped at the eyelet bars (11) of the creel. The compressed air can be blown from blower tubes parallel to the jib carriers (23), which have blower openings distributed along their length to the yarn guides (12). An Independent claim is included for a jet blower trolley, with a system to stop it in front of the vertical rows of yarn brakes (10). It is fitted with jets (25) with jet openings of a cross section of 0.2-30.0 mm<2>. Preferred Features: At least two jets (25) are at the leading end of the jib carrier (23). A system has an adjustment mechanism to set the position of the jets (25), with an adjustment operating control, which can be a jet body (24) with at least two jets (25) as the adjustment unit. Or the jet position can be set by a pneumatic sliding system with horizontal pneumatic tubes through the jib carriers (23), containing sliding pistons linked to the jet bodies (24). The jet bodies (24) can have shafts which are rotated mechanically to position the jets. A vertical setting unit (30), which supports the jib carriers (23), can be moved to set the jet positions. The jets (25) are linked to the compressed air supply through air lines to the jet bodies (24), which can be closed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/70 (2006.01); D02H 1/00 (2006.01); D02H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 11/00 (2013.01); B65H 54/702 (2013.01); D02H 1/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/531 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19924690 A1 20001130; DE 19924690 B4 20070412; DE 50014131 D1 20070419; EP 1096046 A2 20010502; EP 1096046 A3 20010523; EP 1096046 B1 20070307

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070307

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071026

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070307

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-10-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-06-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070618

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014131 P 20070419

2007-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2005-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI