Global Patent Index - EP 1096048 A2

EP 1096048 A2 2001-05-02 - Automatic needle loom for the manufacture of ribbons

Title (en)

Automatic needle loom for the manufacture of ribbons

Title (de)

Automatische Nadelwebmaschine zur Herstellung von Bänder

Title (fr)

Métier automatique à aiguilles pour la fabrication de rubans

Publication

EP 1096048 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120131 A

Priority

IT MI992011 A

Abstract (en)

A device for textile product manufacture comprising a jacquard system (3) for warp thread shed formation characterised in that the jacquard operation is driven by a synchronous motor (1) separated from the motor (2) which drives the weaving loom movement and synchronised with the same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 3/32; D03C 3/26; D03D 35/00; D03D 51/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/26 (2006.01); D03C 3/32 (2006.01); D03D 51/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/32 (2013.01); D03C 3/26 (2013.01); D03C 13/02 (2013.01); D03D 51/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096048 A2 20010502; EP 1096048 A3 20010509; IT 1313636 B1 20020909; IT MI992011 A1 20010328; IT MI992011 D0 19990928

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020923

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI