Global Patent Index - EP 1096052 A2

EP 1096052 A2 2001-05-02 - Method for controlling the lint filter in an automatic clothes washing machine

Title (en)

Method for controlling the lint filter in an automatic clothes washing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Überwachung der Flusenfilter in einer Waschmachine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour surveiller le filtre à peluche dans une machine à laver

Publication

EP 1096052 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120377 A

Priority

IT PN990081 A

Abstract (en)

In a clothes washing machine that comprises a washing tub (4) containing a drum (5), and is adapted to carry out a rinse cycle with water at a level (L3), as well as a water discharge phase down to a minimum level (L0), the method calls for: during the discharge phase (t1-t4), the time interval (T) to be measured, which elapses from an instant (t2), in which the water in the tub lowers to a level (L2) corresponding to the bottom of the drum (5), to a subsequent instant (t3), in which the water decreases down to a level (L1); and when the so measured interval (T) is detected to be longer than a given threshold value (Tr), a signal to be generated which is indicative of a clogged state of the lint filter (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/08 (2006.01); D06F 39/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/082 (2013.01); D06F 39/10 (2013.01); D06F 2202/085 (2013.01); D06F 2220/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096052 A2 20010502; EP 1096052 A3 20010704; IT 1311716 B1 20020319; IT PN990081 A1 20010430; IT PN990081 D0 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI