Global Patent Index - EP 1096053 A1

EP 1096053 A1 2001-05-02 - Drying and ironing machine comprising a temperature and humidity dependent regulating device

Title (en)

Drying and ironing machine comprising a temperature and humidity dependent regulating device

Title (de)

Trocknungs- und Bügelmaschine mit einer Temperatur- und feuchtigkeitsabhängigen Regelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Sécheuse-repasseuse équipée d'un dispositif de régulation en fonction de la température et de l'humidité

Publication

EP 1096053 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402748 A

Priority

FR 9912395 A

Abstract (en)

The rotary iron, for laundry, has at least one main rotary cylinder (10-12) and a counter pressure unit (30), together with a drive (20) to carry the laundry through the iron. A monitor (60) registers the absolute value of the steam emerging from the final cylinder (10), linked to a control (50). The control (50) modifies at least two of the three parameters of the temp. of the final cylinder (10), the force applied by the counter pressure unit (30) and the speed of the drive (20), as a function of the relative humidity and the temp. measured by the monitor (60). The monitor has a trap (61,62) to deflect the atmosphere in the vicinity of the final cylinder (10) into a chamber (62) fitted with at least one fan (63). The chamber (62) has at least one humidity sensor (64) and at least one temp. sensor (65). The trap has at least one tube (61) with a narrow dia., with one end close to the outlet from the final cylinder (10), and the other end leading into the chamber (62). The outer surface of the cylinders (10) is covered with an insulating cladding, in turn covered by a heating film or fabric. An Independent claim is included for a laundry ironing operation, where initially the atmosphere in the vicinity of the final cylinder (10) is measured for humidity and temp. The measured humidity is compared with a nominal value. On a deviation from the nominal value, at least two parameters of the ironing action are modified, to bring the measured values into line with the nominal humidity value. Preferred Features: The variations are made as a function of the absolute humidity measurements taken from the relative humidity and temp. Corrections are made if the relative humidity value is outside 95-99%.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une sécheuse-repasseuse équipée d'un dispositif de régulation en fonction de la température et de l'humidité. La sécheuse-repasseuse comportant au moins un cylindre principal (10 à 12) rotatif destiné à chauffer le linge à sécher, des moyens (30) pour exercer une contre-pression, et des moyens (20) d'entraînement des moyens de convoyage du linge dans la sécheuse-repasseuse, caractérisée en ce que la sécheuse-repasseuse comporte également des moyens (60) de mesure du taux absolu de vapeur d'eau à la sortie du dernier cylindre principal (10), les moyens (60) de détermination étant connectés à des moyens (50) de contrôle permettant de faire varier, au moins deux parmi les trois paramètres de fonctionnement suivants, la température du dernier cylindre principal (10), la force exercée par les moyens (30) de contre-pression, la vitesse des moyens (20) d'entraînement des moyens de convoyage du linge, en fonction de la valeur du taux d'humidité relative et de la température mesurés par les moyens (60) de mesure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 67/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 67/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 67/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096053 A1 20010502; EP 1096053 B1 20041229; AT 286166 T 20050115; DE 60017057 D1 20050203; FR 2800398 A1 20010504; FR 2800398 B1 20020308

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050529

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-05 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-07-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041229

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-03-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-03-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017057 P 20050203

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030704

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI