Global Patent Index - EP 1096056 A1

EP 1096056 A1 2001-05-02 - Wrinkle resistant composition

Title (en)

Wrinkle resistant composition

Title (de)

Zusammensetzung zum Knitterfestmachen

Title (fr)

Composition pour rendre infroissable

Publication

EP 1096056 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870222 A

Priority

EP 99870222 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a wrinkle reducing composition comprising a cross-linking resin having the property of being cationic and a component having the property of being co-cross linked with the resin and/or a component comprising at least one unit which provides a dye transfer inhibiting benefit; and article of manufacture thereof. Also herein provided are method of treating fabrics for imparting various benefits including reducing wrinkles; improving the natural drape of fabrics, imparting a crisp finish to fabrics, reducing the time and/or effort involved to iron fabrics, imparting crease resistance to fabrics, imparting post wash wrinkle resistance to fabrics, imparting in-wear wrinkle resistance to fabrics, imparting a reduction of the fabric aging upon multiple application.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 15/11; C08L 39/06; D06M 15/423; D06M 15/61

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/17 (2006.01); C08L 39/06 (2006.01); C08L 61/20 (2006.01); C08L 79/02 (2006.01); C08L 83/00 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); D06M 13/467 (2006.01); D06M 15/11 (2006.01); D06M 15/356 (2006.01); D06M 15/423 (2006.01); D06M 15/55 (2006.01); D06M 15/59 (2006.01); D06M 15/61 (2006.01); D06M 15/643 (2006.01); D06M 15/647 (2006.01); D06M 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/647 (2013.01); C11D 3/227 (2013.01); C11D 3/3769 (2013.01); C11D 11/0017 (2013.01); D06M 15/11 (2013.01); D06M 15/3562 (2013.01); D06M 15/423 (2013.01); D06M 15/55 (2013.01); D06M 15/59 (2013.01); D06M 15/61 (2013.01); D06M 15/6436 (2013.01); D06M 23/06 (2013.01); D06M 2200/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096056 A1 20010502; AU 1242501 A 20010508; BR 0015097 A 20020716; CN 1384895 A 20021211; EP 1224354 A1 20020724; JP 2003513177 A 20030408; MX PA02004209 A 20021017; WO 0131113 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040522

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031110

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI