Global Patent Index - EP 1096061 A2

EP 1096061 A2 2001-05-02 - Wall covering and process for its manufacture

Title (en)

Wall covering and process for its manufacture

Title (de)

Wandbekleidung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Revêtement de parois et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1096061 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117094 A

Priority

DE 19952395 A

Abstract (en)

Wall lining fixed to a wall using an adhesive contains foreign fibers coated with a barrier material on the surface facing the wall. An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of a wall lining comprising embedding foreign fibers into the wall lining during manufacture. Preferred Features: The foreign fibers are made of plastic, mineral and/or glass fibers. The wall lining contains wood chips or other particles. The lining further contains a synthetic binder.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Wandbekleidung, welche mit ihrer wandseitigen Flache mittels eines Klebers oder Kleisters an einer Wand befestigt wird, wobei die Wandbekleidung zusätzlich Fremdfasern enthält und auf der wandseitigen Fläche mit einem Barrieremittel beschichtet ist. Die Erfindung bezieht sich auch auf ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Wandbekleidung, wobei während des Herstellverfahrens zusätzlich Fremdfasern eingearbeitet werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06N 7/00; D21H 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06N 7/0002 (2013.01); D06N 3/0022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096061 A2 20010502; EP 1096061 A3 20030820; DE 19952395 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-06-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI