Global Patent Index - EP 1096064 A2

EP 1096064 A2 2001-05-02 - Process and apparatus for dewatering a fibrous web

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for dewatering a fibrous web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entwässerung einer Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la déshydratation d' une bande fibreuse

Publication

EP 1096064 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120906 A

Priority

DE 19951794 A

Abstract (en)

The station (10) for the extraction of water from a wet paper/cardboard web (12) has a water extraction zone (E), where the water is driven out at least partially by the effects of a displacement gas (14) under pressure. In the water extraction zone (E), the web (12) passes through a number of stages where it is subjected to a number of gas pressure pulses (141-144). Within the water extraction zone (E), a number of extraction stations (16,18,20,22) are at intervals on the web (12) path, where water is displaced from the web. The pressure level can be adjusted for at least one of the gas pulses (141-144), and their pressures can be set independently of each other. The web (12) moves through the water extraction zone (E) together with a membrane (26), which is pressed against the web by the pulsed pressure gas (14). A fourdrinier or blanket (24) is on the other side of the web (12). The gas pulses (141-142) are at different time frequencies. An Independent claim is included for a water extraction station (10) for a paper/cardboard web (12), where it is passed through a water extraction zone (E) with a number of spaced extraction units (16,18,20,22), in succession, with displacement gas pulses directed under pressure at the web (12).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren und einer entsprechenden Vorrichtung zur Entwässerung einer Faserstoffbahn (12), insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn, wird die Faserstoffbahn (12) durch eine Entwässerungszone (E) geführt, in der sie zumindest teilweise durch eine Beaufschlagung mit unter Druck stehendem Verdrängungsgas (14) entwässert wird. Dabei wird die Faserstoffbahn (12) innerhalb der Entwässerungszone (E) nacheinander durch mehrere Gasdruckimpulse (141 - 144) beaufschlagt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096064 A2 20010502; EP 1096064 A3 20020123; DE 19951794 A1 20010503; US 6475343 B1 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080229

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI