Global Patent Index - EP 1096067 A2

EP 1096067 A2 2001-05-02 - Former

Title (en)

Former

Title (de)

Former

Title (fr)

Forme

Publication

EP 1096067 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120716 A

Priority

DE 19950805 A

Abstract (en)

A former with two wire screen belts (16, 18) has both belts taken round at least two, preferably three rolls (22, 24, 26) in an alternate S-configuration. At least one of the rolls (22) has an open surface and is under vacuum. Other rolls can have a closed surface and act as press rolls. An additional belt (30) of cloth or soft material is taken over two of the rolls (24, 26).

Abstract (de)

Ein Former (10) einer Maschine zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn weist wenigstens eine Gapformereinheit (12) auf, die einen zugeordneten Stoffauflauf (14) und zwei umlaufende endlose Siebe (16, 18) umfaßt, die unter Bildung eines Stoffeinlaufspaltes (20) zusammenlaufen. Dabei ist zumindest eine Gapformereinheit (12) vorgesehen, die wenigstens zwei, vorzugsweise wenigstens drei Walzen (22, 24, 26) umfaßt, die jeweils zumindest teilweise gemeinsam von den beiden Sieben (16, 18) umschlungen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01); D21F 9/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19950805 A1 20010426; EP 1096067 A2 20010502; EP 1096067 A3 20010905

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050527

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031219

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI IT SE

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020305

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI