Global Patent Index - EP 1096075 A2

EP 1096075 A2 2001-05-02 - Wall support for fixing a mounting frame on a wall

Title (en)

Wall support for fixing a mounting frame on a wall

Title (de)

Wandhalterung zur Befestigung eines Montagegestells an einer Wand

Title (fr)

Support mural pour fixer un cadre de montage sur un mur

Publication

EP 1096075 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810843 A

Priority

CH 197299 A

Abstract (en)

The wall retainer is for the fixture of an installation frame (2) to a wall (3) and involves a screw (5) fitted to the frame and a wall angle (11) fitted to the upper end of the screw. The wall angle is pivotable around an axis running crossways to the longitudinal axis of the screw. On the screw a bearing part (8) is screwed and the wall angle is pivotably located on it. The bearing part is a rotary bolt. The wall angle is somewhat U-shaped in cross-section and has a bearing hole (13) in its two legs (12). The bearing part has at least one radially projecting mushroom-shaped bearing pin (10), on which the wall angle is located.

Abstract (de)

Die Wandhalterung weist eine am Montagegestell (2) zu befestigende Schraube (5) und einen an einem inneren Ende dieser Schraube (5) angebrachten Wandwinkel (11) auf. Der Wandwinkel (11) ist um eine quer zur Längsachse der Schraube (5) verlaufende Achse (A) schwenkbar. Dies ermöglicht die Ausrichtung des Wandwinkels (11) an eine geneigt zur Ebene des Montagegestells (2) verlaufende Wand (3') und insbesondere eine Eckmontage <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 11/14; E03C 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/143 (2013.01); A47K 2201/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0786562 A1 19970730 - GEBERIT TECHNIK AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20015024 U1 20001228; AT 348223 T 20070115; AT 4773 U1 20011126; DE 50013851 D1 20070125; EP 1096075 A2 20010502; EP 1096075 A3 20030102; EP 1096075 B1 20061213

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170912

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-06-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-05-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013851

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2013-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013851

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013851

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120918

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120918

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120918

2013-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL A.G.

- Effective date: 20120930

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-03-24 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100304

2010-02-26 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG

- Free text: GEBERIT TECHNIK AG#SCHACHENSTRASSE 77#8645 JONA (CH) -TRANSFER TO- GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG#SCHACHENSTRASSE 77#8645 JONA (CH)

2010-02-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100121 AND 20100127

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070918

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-05-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070514

2007-03-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070324

2007-03-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070313

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013851 P 20070125

2007-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI