Global Patent Index - EP 1096078 A2

EP 1096078 A2 2001-05-02 - Method for connecting building boards offset to one another and building board for carrying out this method

Title (en)

Method for connecting building boards offset to one another and building board for carrying out this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verbinden von aneinander versetzten Bauplatten und Bauplatte zur Duchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la connexion de panneaux de construction décalés les uns par rapport aux autres et panneaux de construction pour la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé

Publication

EP 1096078 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890168 A

Priority

AT 181499 A

Abstract (en)

The process is for connecting together contiguous sheets (1,2) of building materials. The sheets each have a flat rabbet surface adjacent to the joint line, and the resultant shallow channel (20) is covered by a web (3) fixed to both of the sheets. The channel (20) is approximately 0.5 - 1.5 mm depth, and the web may have a self- adhesive backing. The web may be covered with a filler composition.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Verbinden von aneinander versetzten Bauplatten (1, 2). Dabei werden die Bauplatten (1, 2) an ihrer einen Seite mit an mindestens zwei der Seitenränder anliegende, flachen Vertiefungen (11, 21) versehen und wird in die durch zwei aneinander versetzte Bauplatten (1, 2) gebildete flache Vertiefung (20) eine die Fuge (10) überdeckende Matte (3) eingebracht und an den beiden Bauplatten (1, 2) befestigt (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096078 A2 20010502; EP 1096078 A3 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021007

- Countries: AL

2003-05-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021007

- Countries: LT

2003-05-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021007

- Countries: LV

2003-05-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021007

- Countries: MK

2003-05-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021007

- Countries: RO

2003-05-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021007

- Countries: SI

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04F 13/04 A, 7E 04C 2/04 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI