Global Patent Index - EP 1096081 A1

EP 1096081 A1 2001-05-02 - Prefabricated guardrail element

Title (en)

Prefabricated guardrail element

Title (de)

Vorgerfertigtes Geländerelement

Title (fr)

Elément de garde-corps préfabriqué

Publication

EP 1096081 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114960 A

Priority

DE 19935809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19935809A1] The prefabricated element (10) which is to connect onto a supporting structure has a ladder (18) fixed thereon. The ladder can be telescopic and can be mounted eccentric relative to the width of the railing element. The railing element can have an integrated or attachable platform fitment

Abstract (de)

Ein vorgefertigtes Geländerelement (10) ist an eine tragende Struktur anbringbar und weist eine fest daran angebrachte Leiter (18) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 1/26; E04G 21/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/10 (2006.01); E04G 5/14 (2006.01); E04G 21/32 (2006.01); E06C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 9/10 (2013.01); E04G 5/10 (2013.01); E04G 5/14 (2013.01); E04G 21/3223 (2013.01); E04G 2001/155 (2013.01); E04G 2005/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19935809 A1 20010308; DE 19935809 C2 20030731; EP 1096081 A1 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040623

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI