Global Patent Index - EP 1096083 A2

EP 1096083 A2 2001-05-02 - Electronic flat key

Title (en)

Electronic flat key

Title (de)

Elektronischer Flachschlüssel

Title (fr)

Clé plate électronique

Publication

EP 1096083 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00402949 A

Priority

DE 19952247 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19952247C1] The flat key has a grip part (2) provided by a housing (4) with two housing half shells (5,6) of metal or a metalized plastics, enclosing an electronic circuit (12) for remote operation of a lock or a central locking system and providing a battery compartment (16), receiving the supply source battery (17) for the electronic circuit. The key shaft (3) is pivoted relative to the grip part between a stowed position in which it lies in a recess provided along the side of the grip part and a projecting operating position. A non-conductive frame element (7) enclosing the electronic circuit fits between the housing half shells, with a part which projects up to the outer surface of the housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen elektronischen Flachschlüssel mit einem Griffteil (2) und einem Schlüsselbart (3), wobei das Griffteil (2) ein Gehäuse (4) umfaßt, in dem eine elektronische Schaltungseinrichtung (12) zur Fernbetätigung eines Schlosses oder Schloßsystems sowie eine Aufnahme (16) für mindestens eine Batterie (17) zur Stromversorgung der Schaltungseinrichtung angeordnet ist, wobei das Griffteilgehäuse (4) zwei schalenförmig ausgebildete Seitenteile (5,6) umfaßt, und wobei der Schlüsselbart (3) von einer eingeklappten Stellung, bei der er sich in einer seitlichen Vertiefung (10) des Griffteilgehäuses (4) befindet, in eine ausgeklappte Stellung verschwenkbar an dem Griffteilgehäuse (4) angeordnet ist. Um zu erreichen, daß das Griffteilgehäuse (4) auch aus metallischen schalenförmig aufgebauten Seitenteilen (5,6) besteht, ohne daß hierdurch eine wesentliche Beeinflussung (elektrische Abschattung) der in dem Gehäuse (4) befindlichen Sende- und/oder Empfangselemente zur Fernbetätigung eines Schlosses oder Schloßsystems erfolgt, schlägt die Erfindung vor, zwischen den beiden aus Metall bestehenden schalenförmig ausgebildeten Seitenteilen (5,6) des Griffteilgehäuses (4) ein rahmenförmig ausgebildetes Mittelteil (7) aus einem elektrisch nicht leitenden Material anzuordnen, welches randseitig mindestens in Teilbereichen (8) des Griffteilgehäuses (4) bis an die äußere Oberfläche (9) des Gehäuses (4) reicht und für eine ausreichende Signalübertragung zwischen den im Griffteilgehäuse (4) und den im Schloßbereich bzw. Schloßsystembereich befindlichen Sende- und/oder Empfangselementen ausreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/04; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/32 (2006.01); E05B 19/04 (2006.01); E05B 19/08 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/043 (2013.01); A45C 11/324 (2013.01); G07C 9/00944 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00587 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00952 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7808 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7825 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7876 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3902537 C2 19901122

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19952247 C1 20010405; EP 1096083 A2 20010502; EP 1096083 A3 20030115; US 6499326 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040814

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 19/04 A, 7E 05B 49/00 B, 7G 07C 9/00 B, 7A 45C 11/32 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI