Global Patent Index - EP 1096087 A2

EP 1096087 A2 2001-05-02 - Motor vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Motor vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss

Title (fr)

Fermeture de porte de véhicule à moteur

Publication

EP 1096087 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123093 A

Priority

DE 19951463 A

Abstract (en)

Current passed through the drive motor, torque developed and/or its rotary speed are ramped (R1, R2, R3) down.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um einen Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluß mit wenigstens einem elektromotorischen Antrieb (1), insbesondere Zentralverriegelungsantrieb (1), und mit einer von dem Antrieb (1) beaufschlagbaren Abtriebseinrichtung (2, 3, 4, 5), wie z. B. Getriebe (2, 3), Abtriebselement (4), Zentralverriegelungshebel (5) usw.. Der Antrieb (1) wird zumindest innerhalb eines zur Verstellung der Abtriebseinrichtung (2, 3, 4, 5) erforderlichen Zeitintervalls (Z) bestromt. Innerhalb oder am Ende des Zeitintervalls (Z) - zum Blockadezeitpunkt (BZ) - wird der Antrieb (1) üblicherweise mechanisch blockiert. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Bestromung des Antriebes (1) und damit dessen Drehmoment und/oder Drehzahl entlang einer Rampe (R1, R2) verringert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/36; E05B 17/22; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 77/48 (2014.01); E05B 81/06 (2014.01); E05B 81/16 (2014.01); E05B 81/40 (2014.01); E05B 81/60 (2014.01); E05B 81/62 (2014.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 77/48 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/40 (2013.01); E05B 81/60 (2013.01); E05B 81/62 (2013.01); Y10S 388/904 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3526501 C2 19870507

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096087 A2 20010502; EP 1096087 A3 20010530; EP 1096087 B1 20061213; DE 19951463 A1 20010503; DE 50013852 D1 20070125; US 6407520 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013852

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-08-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-07-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061213

2007-03-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070324

2007-03-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070313

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013852 P 20070125

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010721

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI