Global Patent Index - EP 1096091 A2

EP 1096091 A2 2001-05-02 - Obstruction detection for a window

Title (en)

Obstruction detection for a window

Title (de)

Hinderniserkenning für ein Fenster

Title (fr)

Détection d'obstruction pour une fenêtre

Publication

EP 1096091 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203486 A

Priority

GB 9925307 A

Abstract (en)

A system (20) for the detection of an obstruction in the path of a closing window (14) which is movable by an electric motor (16), the system comprising a high frequency oscillator (22) for oscillating the window; a transmitter (24) mountable on the window for transmitting a surface wave across the window; a receiver (26) mountable on the window for receiving the surface waves transmitted across the window by the transmitter; and a control unit (28) for monitoring the surface waves received by the receiver, the control unit being connectable to the electric motor to control the operation of the motor dependent on the surface waves received by the receiver. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/00; B60J 1/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/431 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096091 A2 20010502; EP 1096091 A3 20040414; GB 2355762 A 20010502; GB 2355762 B 20031029; GB 9925307 D0 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060902

2005-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI