Global Patent Index - EP 1096098 A2

EP 1096098 A2 2001-05-02 - Roller shutter

Title (en)

Roller shutter

Title (de)

Rolladenpanzer

Title (fr)

Volet roulant

Publication

EP 1096098 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120825 A

Priority

AT 179499 A

Abstract (en)

A reinforced roller blind comprises linked roller elements composed of light transparent and non-transparent sections. The elements (2,2') are wound on a shaft and at least partially diffuse light.

Abstract (de)

Rolladenpanzer mit gelenkig miteinander verbundenen lichtundurchlässigen und lichtdurchlässigen Rolladenelementen, die auf einer Wickelwelle aufwickelbar sind, wobei die lichtdurchlässigen Rolladenelemente (2, 2', 2") zumindest teilweise diffus streuend ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/165 (2006.01); E06B 9/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/165 (2013.01); E06B 2009/1527 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096098 A2 20010502; EP 1096098 A3 20030507; EP 1096098 B1 20050309; EP 1096098 B8 20070110; AT 414314 B 20070115; AT A179499 A 20010415; DE 50013620 D1 20061123

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013620

- Representative's name: RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE LORENZ SEIDLER GOSS, DE

2012-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013620

- Representative's name: LORENZ SEIDLER GOSSEL RECHTSANWAELTE PATENTANW, DE

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070925

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013620 P 20061123

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH IT LI

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI