Global Patent Index - EP 1096112 A1

EP 1096112 A1 2001-05-02 - Device for changing the timing of gas exchange valves of a combustion engine, especially hydraulic vane cell timer

Title (en)

Device for changing the timing of gas exchange valves of a combustion engine, especially hydraulic vane cell timer

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verändern der Steuerzeiten von Gaswechselventilen einer Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere hydraulische Nockenwellen-Verstelleinrichtung in Rotationskolbenbauart

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour modifier le calage de soupapes d'un moteur a combustion interne, notamment un déphaseur avec des éléments de transmissions rotationnels

Publication

EP 1096112 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121419 A

Priority

DE 19951391 A

Abstract (en)

The device (1) is fastened to a camshaft (3) and consists of a drive pulley (4) and a rotor wheel (5). The side wall (9) of the drive pulley facing the camshaft is formed as a formed round blank with thin walls and low weight, requiring less space. The blank has an angled edge section (17), which at least partially surrounds the peripheral wall (7) of the pulley. The pulley side wall (8) away from the camshaft, the peripheral wall, and the pulley toothing (6), are fastened to each other via common connections. The side wall facing the camshaft is fastened non-detachable to the drive pulley via a separate connection (18), which increases its axial rigidity.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine als hydraulische Nockenwellen-Verstelleinrichtung in Rotationskolbenbauart ausgebildete Vorrichtung (1), die an einer im Zylinderkopf (2) einer Brennkraftmaschine gelagerten Nockenwelle (3) angeordnet ist und aus einem mit einer Kurbelwelle über eine Verzahnung (6) in Antriebsverbindung stehenden Antriebsrad (4) sowie aus einem drehfest mit der Nockenwelle (3) verbundenen Flügelrad (5) besteht. Das Antriebsrad (4) besteht aus einer Umfangswand (7), einer nockenwellenabgewandten Seitenwand (8) und einer nockenwellenzugewandte Seitenwand (9), die zusammen einen Hohlraum bilden, in dem durch mindestens zwei Begrenzungswände (11) mindestens ein hydraulischer Arbeitsraum angeordnet ist. Das Flügelrad (5) weist mindestens einen Flügel (14) auf, und unterteilt mit jedem Flügel (14) einen hydraulischen Arbeitsraum in zwei hydraulische Druckkammern. Erfindungsgemäß ist die nockenwellenzugewandte Seitenwand (9) des Antriebsrades (4) als gewichts- und bauraumreduzierendes, dünnwandiges Rondenformteil ausgebildet, welches eine die Umfangswand (7) des Antriebsrades (4) teilweise umschließende, rechtwinklig abgewinkelte Randpartie (17) aufweist und durch eine separate Anbindung (18) am Antriebsrad (4) unlösbar befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/3442 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34479 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5941203 A 19990824 - SATO ATSUSHI [JP]
  • [A] DE 19756016 A1 19990624 - PORSCHE AG [DE], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 09 30 September 1996 (1996-09-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 11 30 September 1999 (1999-09-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096112 A1 20010502; EP 1096112 B1 20040915; AT 276432 T 20041015; DE 19951391 A1 20010705; JP 2001173415 A 20010626; US 6418893 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50007756

- Effective date: 20150210

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50007756

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50007756

- Effective date: 20140213

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50007756

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50007756

- Effective date: 20120828

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070929

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050928

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050215

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INA-SCHAEFFLER K.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060929

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050928

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INA-SCHAEFFLER K.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050125

2004-12-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041226

2004-12-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007756 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INA-SCHAEFFLER KG

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI