Global Patent Index - EP 1096118 A1

EP 1096118 A1 2001-05-02 - Controlled self-ignition combustion process and four cycle engine with transfer conduits between exhaust and intake conduit

Title (en)

Controlled self-ignition combustion process and four cycle engine with transfer conduits between exhaust and intake conduit

Title (de)

Überwachtes Selbstzündungsverbrennungsverfahren und Viertaktbrennkraftmaschine mit Transferleitungen zwischen Auslass-und Einlassleitung

Title (fr)

Procédé de combustion par autoallumage contrôlé et moteur à quatre temps associe avec conduits de transfert entre conduit d'échappement et conduit d'admission

Publication

EP 1096118 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402828 A

Priority

FR 9914022 A

Abstract (en)

The control procedure, for use on a multi-cylinder 4-stroke engine with each cylinder (1) having at least one inlet (2) and exhaust (3) duct, consists of taking a quantity of the exhaust gas from one cylinder when the engine is under partial load and transferring it to the inlet duct of another via valves (4, 7). During the transfer the gas can be thermally insulated and/or reheated by catalysis in a common transfer duct (5). At the same time as the gas is heated, the catalyst (10) can be used to reduce the pollutants in it.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un moteur et un procédé de contrôle de la combustion par auto-allumage d'un moteur 4 temps comprenant plusieurs cylindres (1) ayant chacun au moins un moyen d'admission (2) comprenant un conduit d'admission et au moins un moyen d'échappement (3) comprenant un conduit d'échappement. Pendant le fonctionnement à charge partielle du moteur, on prélève une quantité de gaz d'échappement depuis le conduit d'échappement d'un cylindre, et on transfère une quantité de gaz brûlés vers le conduit d'admission d'au moins un autre cylindre. Dans une variante, un conduit de transfert est commun à tous les cylindres. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 1/12 (2006.01); F02D 21/08 (2006.01); F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 1/12 (2013.01); F02M 26/42 (2016.02); F02B 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096118 A1 20010502; EP 1096118 B1 20050126; AT 288027 T 20050215; DE 60017670 D1 20050303; DE 60017670 T2 20050630; FR 2800126 A1 20010427; FR 2800126 B1 20011130; JP 2001159376 A 20010612; US 6431128 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-10-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017670 P 20050303

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT NL SE

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IT NL SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT NL SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI