Global Patent Index - EP 1096132 A2

EP 1096132 A2 2001-05-02 - Improved fuel vaporizer method and apparatus

Title (en)

Improved fuel vaporizer method and apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verdampfung von Brennstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de vaporisation de carburant

Publication

EP 1096132 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309490 A

Priority

  • CA 2287546 A
  • US 53926500 A

Abstract (en)

A burner for a heater including an uptube for the vaporisation of fuel within and below the outlet thereof. The uptube is surrounded by a casing and heat transfer members extend between the casing and the uptube to transfer heat from the combustion area outside the casing to the uptube. A series of additional heat transfer members are mounted on the outside of the casing at intermittent locations along the uptube. The additional heat transfer members assist in gathering heat from the combustion area and transferring the same to the casing, thence to the heat transfer members between the casing and the uptube, and thence to the uptube. Such heat transfer raises the temperature of the uptube and assists in vaporising the fuel within the uptube. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 31/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 31/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 31/18 (2013.01); Y02T 10/126 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5490326 A 19960213 - NIELSON LYMAN O [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096132 A2 20010502; EP 1096132 A3 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 31/18 A, 7F 23D 11/44 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI