Global Patent Index - EP 1096135 A2

EP 1096135 A2 2001-05-02 - Injection device for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Injection device for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Einspritzanlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1096135 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123143 A

Priority

DE 19951999 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel injection system has a feed pump (1) for delivering the fuel from the fuel tank (3), followed by a high pressure pump (4) with a number of pump cylinders (5), with a dosing element (7,13) contained in a rinsing channel (22) between the feed pump and the high pressure pump. A distributor element (11) can be inserted between the feed pump and the pump cylinders of the high pressure pump, for distribution of the fuel stream between the individual pump cylinders. The distributor element and the dosing element may be combined in a rotary slider.

Abstract (de)

Einspritzanlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine, mit einer Vörförderpumpe (1) zur Förderung von Kraftstoff aus einem Kraftstofftank (3), einer der Vorförderpumpe (1) stromabwärts nachgeordneten Hochdruckpumpe (4) mit mehreren Pumpzylindern (5) zur Erzeugung des erforderlichen Einspritzdrucks für die Kraftstoffeinspritzung in einen Brennraum einer Brennkraftmaschine, einem zwischen der Vorförderpumpe (1) und der Hochdruckpumpe (4) angeordneten Verteilerelement (11) zur Verteilung des von der Vorförderpumpe (1) geförderten Kraftstoffstroms auf die einzelnen Pumpzylinder (5) der Hochdruckpumpe (4), einer nach der Vorförderpumpe (1) abzweigenden Spülleitung (22), die ausgangsseitig mit der Hochdruckpumpe (4) verbunden ist, um die Hochdruckpumpe (4) mit Kraftstoff zu spülen sowie einem Ventil zur Steuerung des durch die Spülleitung (22) fließenden Kraftstoffstroms, wobei das Ventil (24-27) zur Steuerung des über die Spülleitung (22) fließenden Kraftstoffstroms in das Verteilerelement (11) integriert ist, so daß insbesondere im Startvorgang die Spülleitung gesperrt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/34 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/44 (2013.01); F02M 59/34 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9525887 A1 19950928 - SIEMENS AG [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096135 A2 20010502; EP 1096135 A3 20040331; EP 1096135 B1 20081015; DE 19951999 A1 20010503; DE 19951999 B4 20041118; DE 50015402 D1 20081127

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015402

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141031

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090115

2009-09-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090716

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090115

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081015

2008-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015402 P 20081127

2008-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060213

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 41/06 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 37/18 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/34 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/36 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/02 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI