Global Patent Index - EP 1096139 A1

EP 1096139 A1 2001-05-02 - Starter motor equipped with damping element

Title (en)

Starter motor equipped with damping element

Title (de)

Anlasser mit Dämpfungselement

Title (fr)

Démarreur équipé d'un élément d'amortissement

Publication

EP 1096139 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403007 A

Priority

FR 9913602 A

Abstract (en)

The starter motor (10), comprising a housing with a tip (26) containing the end (20) of its shaft (16) and a bearing (22), has a vibration damper (54) between the bearing and inner surface of the housing tip cavity. The damper is in the form of a sleeve of an elastomer or plastic vibration damping material with a transverse end wall (58), and it can have outer and inner metal lining bushes and end walls.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose un démarreur (10) du type comportant un châssis de démarreur comportant au moins un nez de démarreur (26) formant capot, et comportant alignés axialement, un moteur électrique arrière qui entraîne, un lanceur (50), et du type dans lequel un arbre lanceur (48) comporte un tronçon avant lisse (20) qui est guidé en rotation avec interposition d'un palier de guidage (22) dans un logement (24) du nez de démarreur (26) caractérisé en ce qu'un élément d'amortissement (54) en matériau amortisseur des vibrations est interposé entre le palier de guidage (22) et le logement (24) du nez de démarreur (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096139 A1 20010502; EP 1096139 B1 20040519; DE 60010831 D1 20040624; DE 60010831 T2 20091001; FR 2800421 A1 20010504; FR 2800421 B1 20011130

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161014

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010831 P 20040624

2004-06-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI