Global Patent Index - EP 1096140 A2

EP 1096140 A2 2001-05-02 - Attachment structure of glow plug

Title (en)

Attachment structure of glow plug

Title (de)

Verbindungsstruktur für Glühkerze

Title (fr)

Structure de connexion pour bougie de préchauffage

Publication

EP 1096140 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123123 A

Priority

JP 30581899 A

Abstract (en)

A first glow plug (100) and second through fourth glow plugs (200) are attached to an engine head (1). Each glow plug (100, 200) includes a plug body (700). The first glow plug (100) includes a pressure sensor (300), and is independently connected to a ring crimp terminal (400), which is separated from other glow plugs (200). Thus, a mechanical vibration due to a connecting bar (2) deflection between the second through fourth glow plugs (200) does not influence the first glow plug (100) including the pressure sensor (300). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 19/00 (2006.01); F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 19/00 (2013.01); F23Q 2007/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP 2001973695 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096140 A2 20010502; EP 1096140 A3 20031105; EP 1096140 B1 20041215; EP 1096140 B2 20081217; DE 60016700 D1 20050120; DE 60016700 T2 20060413; DE 60016700 T3 20090723; JP 2001123930 A 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141025

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141025

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60016700

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-17 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20081217

2008-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-03-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-11-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60016700 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030516

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030410

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI