Global Patent Index - EP 1096148 A2

EP 1096148 A2 2001-05-02 - Distribution member for varying the flow rate for a pump

Title (en)

Distribution member for varying the flow rate for a pump

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen eines variablen Volumenstroms für eine Pumpe

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour variation de débit d'une pompe

Publication

EP 1096148 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123142 A

Priority

DE 19952000 A

Abstract (en)

The variable volumetric flow device has a first component (1) with an inlet opening (5) coupled to an inlet (4) and a second coaxial component with at least 2 outlet openings (6a,6b) lying in a common plane, each connected to an outlet coupled to the pump. The coaxial components can slide relative to one another to bring the inlet opening into alignment with the outlet openings, one of the components rotated in synchronism with the pump, the other component remaining stationary.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen eines variablen Volumenstroms für eine Pumpe (21) mit wenigstens zwei Verdrängerelementen, weist ein erstes Bauteil (1) mit einem Einlassdurchbruch (5), der mit einem Kraftstoffeinlass (4) verbunden ist, und ein zweites Bauteil (2,3) mit wenigstens zwei Auslassdurchbrüchen (16), die in einer Ebene liegen und jeweils mit einem Zulauf der Pumpe zugeordneten Auslass (7,8) verbunden sind, auf, wobei das erste (1) und das zweite Bauteil (2,3) ineinander und axial gegeneinander verschiebbar angeordnet sind, um eine Überdeckung des Einlassdurchbruches (5) mit den Auslassdurchbrüchen (6) einzustellen, und wobei eines der Bauteile (1) sich winkelsynchron mit der Pumpe dreht und das andere Bauteil (2) drehfest ausgelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/22; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02M 59/36 (2013.01); F04B 49/002 (2013.01); F04B 49/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096148 A2 20010502; EP 1096148 A3 20060719; EP 1096148 B1 20080102; EP 1096148 B8 20080507; DE 19952000 A1 20010510; DE 19952000 C2 20010816; DE 50014889 D1 20080214

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014889

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141031

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-12-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20111104

2011-12-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20111104

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081003

2008-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-07-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-07-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2008-03-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2008-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014889 P 20080214

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-01-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2007-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060928

2006-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060821

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI