Global Patent Index - EP 1096180 A2

EP 1096180 A2 2001-05-02 - Seal arrangement

Title (en)

Seal arrangement

Title (de)

Dichtunganordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 1096180 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309387 A

Priority

GB 9925751 A

Abstract (en)

A seal arrangement having a bore within which a component (13) is to be received, in use, the seal arrangement comprising a seal member (10) formed from a resilient material, the seal member (10) having an inner periphery (12a) and an outer periphery (12b) and being provided with a fracture to define two ends of the seal member (10). When in a relaxed condition, the inner periphery (12a) of the seal member (10) has a smaller diameter than the diameter of the component (13) such that, when the component (13) is received through the bore of the seal arrangement, the two ends of the seal member (10) are caused to part, the resilience of the seal member (10) causing the inner periphery (12a) of the seal member (10) to form a substantially fluid tight seal with the component (13). The seal arrangement further comprises a support member (18) upon which the seal member (10) is mounted, the support member (18) being of generally annular form and having inner and outer peripheries (20a, 20b), wherein the inner periphery (20a) of the support member (18) is of generally circular form except for a region (28) of irregularity. The invention also relates to a method of manufacturing a seal arrangement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16J 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F16J 9/14 (2006.01); F16J 15/08 (2006.01); F16J 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16J 9/14 (2013.01); F02M 47/00 (2013.01); F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F16J 15/0887 (2013.01); F16J 15/104 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0978650 A2 20000209 - LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096180 A2 20010502; EP 1096180 A3 20021120; EP 1096180 B1 20060104; DE 60025315 D1 20060330; DE 60025315 T2 20060928; GB 9925751 D0 19991229; US 6439203 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60025315

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-05-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130425 AND 20130501

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-04-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060415

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025315 P 20060330

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030704

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 16J 9/00 A, 7F 16J 15/28 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI