Global Patent Index - EP 1096200 A1

EP 1096200 A1 2001-05-02 - Wall heat exchanger for boiler furnace

Title (en)

Wall heat exchanger for boiler furnace

Title (de)

Wandwärmetauscher für Kesselbrennraum

Title (fr)

Echangeur mural pour foyer de chaudière

Publication

EP 1096200 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402678 A

Priority

FR 9913525 A

Abstract (en)

The heat exchanger (5), designed to be mounted on the vertical screen wall (M) of a power station generator boiler, consists of a series of vertical tubes (7) extending between the top (H) and bottom (B) of the exchanger and through which steam circulates between an inlet (E) and an outlet (S) at the bottom of the exchanger, with the tubes turning through 180 degrees at the top. The tubes are all aligned in a plane parallel to the screen wall and form alternate rising and falling circuits either individually or in small groups.

Abstract (fr)

Echangeur thermique (5,6), destiné à être monté sur un mur écran vertical (M) d'un foyer (1) de chaudière de centrale de production d'énergie électrique, constitué de tubes (7) s'étendant suivant ladite direction verticale entre une partie basse (B) de l'échangeur et une partie haute (H) de l'échangeur et dans lesquels de la vapeur d'eau est mise en circulation entre une entrée (E) des tubes de l'échangeur et une sortie (S) de tubes de l'échangeur pour être réchauffée, chaque tube étant coudé en demi-tour en partie haute de l'échangeur, l'entrée (E) et la sortie (S) des tubes de l'échangeur étant disposées en partie basse de l'échangeur, caractérisé en ce que les tubes (7) de l'échangeur sont alignés dans un plan, parallèlement au mur écran (M), et forment individuellement ou par petits groupes une alternance de circuits montants et de circuits descendants. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22G 1/06; F22B 21/30; F22G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/00 (2006.01); F22B 21/30 (2006.01); F22G 1/06 (2006.01); F22G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22G 3/00 (2013.01); F22B 21/30 (2013.01); F22G 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096200 A1 20010502; EP 1096200 B1 20040324; DE 60009230 D1 20040429; DE 60009230 T2 20050414; ES 2214235 T3 20040916; FR 2800440 A1 20010504; FR 2800440 B1 20011130; KR 20010067361 A 20010712

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-21 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Effective date: 20161115

2016-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 60009230

2016-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-09-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2012-05-22 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-05-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER SYSTEMS SA, LAVALLOIS PERRET CEDEX, FR

- Document: DE 60009230

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-05-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER SYSTEMS SA, LAVALLOIS PERRET CEDEX, FR

- Document: DE 60009230

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-05-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-05-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS, MEUDON LA FORET, FR

- Document: DE 60009230

- Effective date: 20120123

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS, MEUDON LA FORET, FR

- Document: DE 60009230

- Effective date: 20120123

2012-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120123

2012-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120123

2012-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

- Effective date: 20120123

2012-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-11-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER SYSTEMS SA, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS, VELIZY-VILLACOUBLA, FR

- Document: DE 60009230

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS, VELIZY-VILLACOUBLA, FR

- Document: DE 60009230

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS, VELIZY-VILLACOUBLA, FR

- Document: DE 60009230

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-09-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60009230

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090928

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090928

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080808

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070928

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214235 T3

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009230 P 20040429

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER BOILERS

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM ENERGY SYSTEMS S.A.

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI FR GB

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI