Global Patent Index - EP 1096211 A2

EP 1096211 A2 2001-05-02 - Device for obtaining containers made of ice, for liquids

Title (en)

Device for obtaining containers made of ice, for liquids

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Behältern aus Eis für Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fabrication de récipients en glace, pour des liquides

Publication

EP 1096211 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122224 A

Priority

IT TV990112 A

Abstract (en)

A device for obtaining containers made of ice, for liquids, particularly chilled beverages, comprising a hollow body (2) which has a closed lower end (3) from which a projection (4) protrudes axially and internally. The hollow body (2) can be closed, at its open upper end (6), by way of a lid (7), which can in turn be closed by way of a partition (11) with inclined walls and provided with at least one protrusion (17) which protrudes toward the projection (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25C 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25C 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25C 1/22 (2013.01); F25D 2331/808 (2013.01); F25D 2331/809 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT MO990112 A 19990525

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096211 A2 20010502; EP 1096211 A3 20010711; IT 1311867 B1 20020319; IT TV990112 A1 20010423

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI