Global Patent Index - EP 1096218 A2

EP 1096218 A2 2001-05-02 - Pointing drive

Title (en)

Pointing drive

Title (de)

Richtantrieb

Title (fr)

Commande de pointage

Publication

EP 1096218 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122062 A

Priority

DE 19951915 A

Abstract (en)

The laying mechanism (10) for a fragmentation round launch tube (12) has a rapid setting for azimuth in the foundation (15), with at least two azimuth setting motors (14) acting on the carrier ring (18), parallel to the azimuth axis. At least one setting motor can be reversed into a drive in the opposite direction, to block the movement from the other motor when the carrier ring (18) has reached the azimuth setting for the launch. The static setting motors are contained within the pot-shaped foundation, with one motor (13) for elevation and a motor (14) for azimuth.

Abstract (de)

Ein Richtantrieb (10), insbesondere zum schnellen Ausrichten der gabelförmigen Schwenkhalterung (19) eines Abschußbehälters (12) für Splittergranaten zur Abwehr eines angreifenden Flugkörpers, soll bei präziser gleichzeitiger Azimut- und Elevationsverstellung für besonders hohe Dynamik seines Richtvorganges trotz großen Gewichts des mit den Splittergranaten bestückten Abschußbehälters (12) ausgelegt werden. Dafür werden die Stellmotore (13, 14) von der Schwenkhalterung (19) fort, gegen Splittereinwirkung geschützt stationär in einen objektfesten Unterbau (15) verlegt, von wo aus sie mit einem im Unterbau (15) verdrehbar gelagerten Tragring (18) für die Schwenkhalterung (19) in Drehverbindung stehen. Der koaxial zur Azimutachse (17) ebenfalls stationär in den Unterbau (15) eingesetzte Elevations-Stellmotor (13) ist mit einem translatorisch wirkenden Abtrieb (23) ausgestattet, der über eine im wesentlichen konzentrisch zur Azimutachse (17) sich erstreckende und vorzugsweise um diese verdrehbare Stützstange (22) die Elevation des Abschußbehälters (12) bestimmt. So wird das erforderliche Drehmoment für die Ausrichtung des Abschußbehälters (12) wesentlich verringert, weil die schweren Stellmotore (13, 14) unbeweglich im Unterbau (15) angeordnet sind und dort träge Reaktionsmassen bilden. Zwischen diesem und der Schwenkhalterung (19) gibt es nur noch eine Azimut-Schnittstelle in Form dessen Tragringes (18), der über ein Momentenlager (26) definiert, also spielfrei dem objektfesten Unterbau (15) gegenüber verspannbar ist. Die translatorische, mit dem Abschußbehälter (12) gegenüber dem Unterbau (15) um die Azimutachse (17) verdrehbare Elevationseinstellung vermeidet zusätzliche Momentenbeanspruchungen des Systemes, das so insgesamt für den schnellen Richtvorgang mechanisch hoch beanspruchbar geworden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 27/12; F41A 27/22; F41A 27/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 27/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 27/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096218 A2 20010502; EP 1096218 A3 20020410; EP 1096218 B1 20040929; AT 278172 T 20041015; DE 19951915 A1 20010510; ES 2233267 T3 20050616; IL 138978 A 20041215; IL 138978 D0 20011125; US 2003177897 A1 20030925; US 6571678 B1 20030603; US 6715397 B2 20040406

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151012

2016-11-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161128

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151012

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151011

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151011

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-07-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151011

2016-05-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007974

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG#FISCHBACHSTRASSE 16#90552 ROETHENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG#FISCHBACHSTRASSE 16#90552 ROETHENBACH (DE)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DIEHL MUNITIONSSYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233267 T3

2005-05-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DIEHL MUNITIONSSYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2005-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: DIEHL MUNITIONSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG#FISCHBACHSTRASSE 16#90552 ROETHENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG#FISCHBACHSTRASSE 16#90552 ROETHENBACH (DE)

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050115

2004-12-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007974 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-10-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2003-01-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 41A 27/12 A, 7F 41A 27/22 B, 7F 41A 27/24 B, 7F 41A 27/28 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI