Global Patent Index - EP 1096383 A1

EP 1096383 A1 2001-05-02 - Reconfigurable color converter

Title (en)

Reconfigurable color converter

Title (de)

Rekonfigurierbarer Farbkonverter

Title (fr)

Convertisseur de couleurs reconfigurable

Publication

EP 1096383 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410126 A

Priority

FR 9913544 A

Abstract (en)

Device comprises input (IN) and output (OUT) buses, memory (36) containing code collection, device for calculating address in 1st memory and device for selection of address, device for calculation of address, and second memory (38) for storage of address generated by device for calculating address of 1st memory. Lastly device (44) selects output code based on code read from 1st memory and code contained in 2nd memory. The invention also relates to an image processing procedure in which images are received where the color codes correspond to an address in a color reference table and each address is replaced by the color designated by this address in the reference table.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un circuit de traitement d'image pour remplacer un code d'entrée associé à un pixel de l'image par un code de sortie choisi dans une première mémoire (36) contenant un ensemble de codes, comportant un bus d'entrée (IN) pour recevoir le code d'entrée, un bus de sortie (OUT) pour délivrer le code de sortie, ladite première mémoire, un moyen (40) de calcul d'adresse de la première mémoire, un moyen (42) de sélection d'adresse de la première mémoire entre le code d'entrée et un code d'adresse généré par le moyen de calcul d'adresse, une deuxième mémoire (38) pour contenir un code d'adresse généré par le moyen de calcul d'adresse, et un moyen (44) de sélection du code de sortie entre un code lu dans la première mémoire et ledit code contenu dans la deuxième mémoire. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 12/02; G06T 9/00; G09G 1/16; G09G 5/02; G09G 5/06; H04N 1/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/02 (2006.01); G09G 5/06 (2006.01); G09G 5/37 (2006.01); G09G 5/393 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/02 (2013.01); G09G 5/06 (2013.01); G09G 5/393 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0276 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096383 A1 20010502; FR 2800180 A1 20010427; FR 2800180 B1 20020104; US 6744439 B1 20040601

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080503

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS S.A.

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LAURY, MARC

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEIGNERET, FRANCK

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHIARUZZI, EMMANUEL

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MONNIER, PHILIPPE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI