Global Patent Index - EP 1096408 A2

EP 1096408 A2 2001-05-02 - Vending machine communication system

Title (en)

Vending machine communication system

Title (de)

Kommunikationssystem für Verkaufsautomaten

Title (fr)

Système de communication pour distributeurs automatiques

Publication

EP 1096408 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309499 A

Priority

US 42862799 A

Abstract (en)

A vending machine communication system and process including a vending machine (12) that vends a product. A vending machine operating software is stored in an operating software memory (18) associated with the vending machine (12). A vending machine controller (10) controls the vending machine (12) as a function of the vending machine operating software. A vending machine I/O port (46, 52) is associated with the vending machine controller (10). A handheld data transfer device (60) has a data transfer I/O port (62, 71) for communicating with the vending machine I/O port (46, 52). The handheld data transfer device (60) has a storage. The transfer device (60) and the vending machine controller (10) are adapted to transfer the vending machine operating software between the storage and the operating software memory (18) via the data transfer I/O port (62, 71), the vending machine I/O port (46, 52), and the vending machine controller (10). As a result, the vending machine operating software is transferred between the operating software memory (18) and the storage. The system also includes the ability to transfer vending machine operating software and vending machine data from one vending machine (12) to another (12'), using the handheld data transfer device (60). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G07F 5/18 (2006.01); G07F 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/002 (2013.01); G07F 5/18 (2013.01); G07F 9/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096408 A2 20010502; EP 1096408 A3 20020814; CA 2323292 A1 20010427; JP 2001188940 A 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036659

2003-11-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030215

2003-06-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI