Global Patent Index - EP 1096409 A1

EP 1096409 A1 2001-05-02 - Wireless auctioning system

Title (en)

Wireless auctioning system

Title (de)

Drahtloses Auktionsverfahren

Title (fr)

Système de traitement d'enchères sans fil

Publication

EP 1096409 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120835 A

Priority

EP 99120835 A

Abstract (en)

A method for determining a final leading price offer for a good using an auction center and a plurality of cellular telephones of a plurality of users, wherein each of said plurality of cellular telephones is assigned to one of said plurality of users, and wherein each of said plurality of cellular telephones has a telephone number, comprising the following steps: a) sending a bidding invitation for said good from said auction center to said plurality of cellular telephones, b) informing said plurality of users about said bidding invitation for said good by means of an acoustical or optical display function of said plurality of cellular telephones, c) returning from at least one of said plurality of cellular telephones price offers for said good to said auction center in response to said bidding invitation on demand of at least one of said plurality of users, d) registering in said auction center each of said price offers and the arrival time at said auction center for each of said price offers, e) determining a present leading price offer for said good by identifying the highest of said price offers having the earliest arrival time at said auction center, f) communicating said present leading price offer to said plurality of cellular telephones, g) repeating at least the above steps c) to f) until a closing criterion is reached, and h) fixing a final leading price offer, which is identical with said present leading price offer which was last determined in a repetition of step e) before said closing criterion was reached.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; G07C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); G07C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/08 (2013.01); G07C 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5835896 A 19981110 - FISHER ALAN S [US], et al
  • [A] US 5259023 A 19931102 - KATZ RONALD A [US]
  • [A] WO 9927476 A2 19990603 - TAYLOR TRUST AS [NO], et al
  • [Y] C.AFZALI: "eBay Goes Wireless With SkyTel Partnership", 13 May 1999 (1999-05-13), pages 1, XP002134096, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.internetnews.com/ec-news/print/0,1089,4_11/041,00.html> [retrieved on 20000211]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096409 A1 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-04-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000428

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI