Global Patent Index - EP 1096430 A2

EP 1096430 A2 2001-05-02 - A system for the management of information relating to the use of a motor vehicle, in particular in the field of civil responsibility

Title (en)

A system for the management of information relating to the use of a motor vehicle, in particular in the field of civil responsibility

Title (de)

Informations-Managementsystem für den Gebrauch von Kraftfahrzeugen, insbesondere auf dem Gebiet der Zivilhaftung

Title (fr)

Système pour la gestion d'information relative à l'utilisation d'un véhicule à moteur, en particulier dans le domaine de la responsabilité civile

Publication

EP 1096430 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122856 A

Priority

IT TO990916 A

Abstract (en)

A system is described for the management of information relating to the use of a motor vehicle and transfer of such information remotely. The system comprises: a control device (DC) capable of being mounted on board the motor vehicle and coupled to an on board electronic control unit (ECU); an electronic memory module (M) of the non-volatile memory type, possibly incorporated in the microprocessor card (SC), separate from the control device (DC) and capable of being coupled to it to receive the detected information as well as to make available to it a set of programming data; and a display device (D) associated with the control device (DC) adapted to present a user of the system with the detected information and/or the programming data. The microprocessor card (SC) is freely transportable and can be coupled, at another time, to a remote processor system to make available to it the information recorded and to receive the programming data. The remote processing system can in this way interpret the detected information, for example the occurrence of the motor vehicle starting and turning off operations, and calculate on the basis of this information the effective time for which the vehicle has been in use and/or other correlated parameters. These parameters can be used to calculate the cost for a predetermined service provided to the motor vehicle user, for example the cost of an insurance policy, as a function of the effective time for which the vehicle has been in use. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 5/08; G05B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/0858 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096430 A2 20010502; EP 1096430 A3 20010606; IT 1314670 B1 20021231; IT TO990916 A1 20010423; IT TO990916 D0 19991022

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080505

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061002

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI