Global Patent Index - EP 1096432 A3

EP 1096432 A3 2002-11-06 - Device for counting and/or sorting coins

Title (en)

Device for counting and/or sorting coins

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zählen und/oder Sortieren von Münzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour compter et/ou trier des pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 1096432 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00250334 A

Priority

  • DE 19951458 A
  • DE 10028934 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1096432A2] Optical devices have a light source (6) and light-sensitive sensor devices (7) set opposite a coin's (1) main surface to convert contact light into electrical signals. The sensor devices are designed as a CCD element. The light source has an emitting source (8) and optical elements to create a parallel bundle of light rays orthogonal to a coin's main surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 3/00 (2006.01); G07D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/02 (2013.01); G07D 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096432 A2 20010502; EP 1096432 A3 20021106; EP 1096432 B1 20120314; AT 549706 T 20120315; DE 10028934 A1 20020110; DE 20023667 U1 20050512; ES 2384767 T3 20120712; NO 20005366 A 20010427; NO 20005366 D0 20001025; NO 327316 B1 20090608; US 6552781 B1 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171012

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170919

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121011

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121011

2013-07-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCAN COIN INDUSTRIES A.B.

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-04-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50016211

- Effective date: 20121217

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120314

2013-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121217

2013-02-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCAN COIN AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCAN COIN INDUSTRIES AB, MALMOE, SE

- Document: DE 50016211

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-02-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCAN COIN AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: F. ZIMMERMANN GMBH & CO. KG, 10785 BERLIN, DE

- Document: DE 50016211

- Effective date: 20120322

2013-02-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50016211

- Representative's name: JUNGBLUT & SEUSS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120716

2012-09-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-08-27 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2012-07-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2384767 T3

- Effective date: 20120712

2012-06-27 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-06-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2012-06-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: SCAN COIN AB, SE

- Document: AT 549706 T

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-05-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50016211

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-04-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-03-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCAN COIN AB

2012-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-03-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 549706 T

- Effective date: 20120315

2012-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2012-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2012-03-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCAN COIN INDUSTRIES AB

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040316

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: AL

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: LT

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: LV

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: MK

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: RO

2003-07-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: SI

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI