Global Patent Index - EP 1096510 A2

EP 1096510 A2 2001-05-02 - Electrical conductor with a rectangular or square cross-section and method of manufacturing it

Title (en)

Electrical conductor with a rectangular or square cross-section and method of manufacturing it

Title (de)

Elektrischer Leiter mit rechteckigem oder quadratischem Querschnitt und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Conducteur électrique avec section rectangulaire ou carrée et méthode de fabrication idoine

Publication

EP 1096510 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00402693 A

Priority

DE 19951709 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical conductor (1) has a rectangular or squared cross section with a first electrically insulating layer (2) that surrounds the conductor on all sides as well as a second side varnished layer (3) on the first layer. The second side varnished layer is only applied on one surface and at most on two surfaces opposite each other.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein elektrischer Leiter (1) mit rechteckigem oder quadratischem Querschnitt mit einer ersten den Leiter allseitig umgebenden elektrisch isolierenden Schicht (2) sowie einer auf der ersten Schicht angeordneten zweiten Backlackschicht (3) beschrieben. Die Backlackschicht (3) ist lediglich auf eine Fläche, höchstens jedoch auf zwei einander gegenüberliegende Flächen aufgebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/06 (2006.01); H01F 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/065 (2013.01); H01F 27/323 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096510 A2 20010502; EP 1096510 A3 20020515; DE 19951709 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-09 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-04-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTRICAL CONDUCTOR WITH A RECTANGULAR OR SQUARE CROSS-SECTION AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING IT

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01B 13/06 A, 7H 01F 27/32 B, 7H 01B 7/00 B

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI