Global Patent Index - EP 1096524 A2

EP 1096524 A2 2001-05-02 - Rotary switch with a removable knob

Title (en)

Rotary switch with a removable knob

Title (de)

Drehschaltvorrichtung mit abnehmbarer Handhabe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commutation rotatif avec bouton amovible

Publication

EP 1096524 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121703 A

Priority

DE 19951301 A

Abstract (en)

The rotary switch has a rotatable knob (1) which is rotated about an axis for operation of a rotary switching device. The knob is snap-fitted to a housing (2) from which it can be released by deflecting it sidewards relative to the housing. The releasable coupling between the knob and the housing is provided by a spring edge (4) and an opposing rigid edge (5) projecting outwards at the base of the knob, for engaging behind the opposing side edges of a locating opening provided by the housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Drehschaltvorrichtung, insbesondere zur Bedienung elektromechanischer Geräte, mit einer um eine Drehachse (3) drehbaren Handhabe (1) zur Betätigung der Drehschaltvorrichtung und einem Gehäuse (2) zur lösbaren Anbringung der Handhabe (1). Die erfindungsgemäße Drehschaltvorrichtung ist konstruktiv besonders einfach aufgebaut, da keine separaten Verbindungsteile erforderlich sind. Erfindungsgemäß ist die Handhabe (1) zur Abnahme vom Gehäuse (2) gegenüber dem Gehäuse (2) in seitlicher Richtung zur Drehachse (3) der Drehschaltvorrichtung verschiebbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/08 (2006.01); H01H 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/08 (2013.01); H01H 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096524 A2 20010502; EP 1096524 A3 20021211; EP 1096524 B1 20050420; DE 19951301 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071004

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071004

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071004

2006-12-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050527

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010092 P 20050525

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 3/08 A, 7G 05G 1/08 B, 7H 01H 19/14 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI