Global Patent Index - EP 1096528 A1

EP 1096528 A1 2001-05-02 - Electrical protective switching device

Title (en)

Electrical protective switching device

Title (de)

Elektrisches Schutzschaltgerät

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur de protection électrique

Publication

EP 1096528 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117608 A

Priority

DE 19952180 A

Abstract (en)

A magnetized cutout blade has first (MA1), second (MA2) and third (MA3) parts. The second part fits between the first and third parts, acts as a pin-shaped extension and does not fit centrally but offset from the center axis of the cutout blade. The third part forms a headpiece for supporting a spring fitted partially next to the second part.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem elektrisches Schutzschaltgerät (1) mit einem Gehäuse (12) aus Isolierstoff, einer Schaltkontaktanordnung, und einer Auslöseeinheit mit einem elektromagnetischen Schnellauslöser (10) umfassend eine Auslösespule (38), einen Magnetkern (68), einen Magnetanker (62) aus magnetisierbaren Material, einem Federelement (64) für den Schnellauslöser (10), und einen Schlaganker (69), wobei der Magnetanker (62) längsbeweglich in einem Aufnahmekörper (60) gelagert ist, soll der Aufbau des Schnellauslöseres derart verbessert werden, daß eine platzsparende und kompakte Bauweise des Gerätes möglich wird. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, daß der Magnetanker (62) ein erstes Teil (MA1), ein zweites Teil (MA2), und ein drittes Teil (MA3) aufweist, daß das zweite Teil (MA2) zwischen dem ersten Teil (MA1) und dem dritten Teil (MA3) angeordnet ist, daß das zweite Teil (MA2) als stiftförmiger Fortsatz mit deutlich geringerem Querschnitt als das erste Teil (MA1) ausgebildet ist, daß das zweite Teil (MA2) nicht zentrisch, sondern aus der Achsmitte des Magnetankers (62) versetzt angeordnet ist, daß das dritte Teil als Kopfstück (63) ausgebildet ist, an dem sich das Federelement (64) abstützt und daß das Federelement (64) zumindest teilweise im Bereich des zweiten Teils (MA2) angeordnet ist. Die Erfindung ist bei Motorschutzschaltern anwendbar <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/2463 (2013.01); H01H 71/2409 (2013.01); H01H 2071/249 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096528 A1 20010502; EP 1096528 B1 20040714; DE 19952180 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140817

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140816

2015-03-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130819

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130807

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130806

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: DTS ZUERICH;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2007-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Representative's name: DTS ZUERICH; CH

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-04-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DTS ZUERICH SCHWEIZER- UND EUROPAEISCHE PATENTANWA

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007055 P 20040819

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2004-05-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTRICAL PROTECTIVE SWITCHING DEVICE

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FAUST, MANFRED

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAUER, KLAUS

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WINZEN, LOTHAR

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAUJAN, GUENTER

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAUMEISTER, RUDOLF

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLECHACZ, VOLKER

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILLERSCHEIDT, PETER

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAMP, HARTMUT

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI