Global Patent Index - EP 1096529 A1

EP 1096529 A1 2001-05-02 - Protective electrical circuit-breaker

Title (en)

Protective electrical circuit-breaker

Title (de)

Elektrisches Schutzschaltgerät

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur de protection électrique

Publication

EP 1096529 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117609 A

Priority

DE 19952186 A

Abstract (en)

The construction of a high-speed circuit breaker is improved so as to allow for the universal use of auxiliary components that have an interface (91) for a circuit breaker bridge (90) operated by a transferring link (96) that uses a transfer ratio to transfer lifting motion acting on the circuit breaker bridge.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Elektrisches Schutzschaltgerät (1) mit einem Gehäuse (12) aus Isolierstoff, einer Schaltkontaktanordnung, einer Auslöseeinheit mit einem elektromagnetischen Schnellauslöser (10) umfassend eine Auslösespule (38), einen Magnetkern (68), einen Magnetanker (62), wobei der Magnetanker (62) längsbeweglich in einem Aufnahmekörper (60) gelagert ist, einem Federelement (64) für den Schnellauslöser (10), einen Schlaganker (69), einer auf eine Schaltschloß wirkende und von dem Magnetanker (62) betätigbare Auslösebrücke (90) mit einen Auslöseelement (92), und einer mit der Auslösebrücke (90) verbundenen Schnittstelle(91) für ein Hilfsbaustein soll der Aufbau des Schnellauslösers derart verbessert werden, daß eine universelle Verwendung von Hilfsbausteinen, die eine Schnittstelle zur Auslösebrücke aufweisen, möglich ist. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, daß das Auslöseelement (90) von einem Übersetzungsglied (96) betätigbar ist, welches die auf die Auslösebrücke (90) wirkende Hubbewegung durch ein Übersetzungsverhältnis kleiner 1:1 überträgt. Die Erfindung ist bei Motorschutzschaltern anwendbar: <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/24; H01H 71/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/24 (2006.01); H01H 71/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/2409 (2013.01); H01H 71/2463 (2013.01); H01H 71/46 (2013.01); H01H 2071/249 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096529 A1 20010502; EP 1096529 B1 20050427; DE 19952186 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170816

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140817

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-03-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130807

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130806

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: DTS ZUERICH;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DTS ZUERICH

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010151 P 20050602

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010707

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI