Global Patent Index - EP 1096542 A1

EP 1096542 A1 2001-05-02 - Flat Viewing screen with a protective grid

Title (en)

Flat Viewing screen with a protective grid

Title (de)

Flasches Bildschirm mit Schutzgitter

Title (fr)

Ecran plat de visualisation à grille de protection

Publication

EP 1096542 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410130 A

Priority

  • FR 9913753 A
  • FR 0004171 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2001176432A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a flat-display screen that protects cathodes from positive ions which exist n the space between electrodes. SOLUTION: This flat display screen includes a cathode (1), equipped with electron emitting means (2) of field effect, a light emitting anode (5) disposed at a side opposite to the cathode (1), an extraction grid (3) made to correspond to the cathode (1), and one or more filtering grids (20, 30, 40). The filtering grids, have transmitting nature with respect to electron bombardment and are biased so that parasitic ions produced at their one side, are inhibited from reaching the cathode or anode disposed at the other side.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un écran plat de visualisation du type comprenant une cathode (1) pourvue de moyens (2) d'émission électronique à effet de champ, une anode (5) cathodoluminescente placée en regard de la cathode, une grille d'extraction (3) associée à la cathode, et au moins une grille de filtrage (20), perméable au bombardement électronique et polarisée pour interdire à des ions parasites, produits d'un côté de cette grille de filtrage, d'atteindre la cathode ou l'anode située de l'autre côté. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 31/12; H01J 1/52; H01J 29/46; H01J 29/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/22 (2006.01); H01J 1/52 (2006.01); H01J 29/06 (2006.01); H01J 29/46 (2006.01); H01J 29/84 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/52 (2013.01); H01J 29/467 (2013.01); H01J 29/84 (2013.01); H01J 31/127 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096542 A1 20010502; FR 2800512 A1 20010504; FR 2800512 B1 20020301; JP 2001176432 A 20010629; US 6683415 B1 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060712

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LE COMMISSARIAT AE L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

2005-03-02 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20050502

2003-04-23 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20020621

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI