Global Patent Index - EP 1096621 A1

EP 1096621 A1 2001-05-02 - Electric connector

Title (en)

Electric connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1096621 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00123864 A

Priority

JP 31050699 A

Abstract (en)

An electric connector 20 comprises a first connector 23 including a plurality of signal terminals and mounted on a main print circuit board 21, a second connector 24 including three connecting pins 24a, 24b and 24c arranged at regular intervals, the first and third connecting pins 24a and 24c being connected to two signal terminals 23d and 23e to be switched in the first connector and a signal to be switched being supplied to the first and third connecting pins through normally-closed contacts 25a and 25b and directly to the second connecting pin 24b, and an auto fuse 30 including two contacts 32 and 33 arranged at a regular interval to be selectively engaged with two continuous connecting pins on one of sides or the other side of the second connector, the two contacts being electrically connected to each other, and serving to open the normally-closed contact coming in contact with the first or third connecting pin when being engaged with the second connector, wherein the two signal terminals 23d and 23e to be switched in the first connector and the first and third connecting pins 24a and 24c of the second connector are mounted on a sub-print circuit board 31 including connecting patterns 31a and 31b to be connected to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 29/00; H01R 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 29/00 (2006.01); H01R 31/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/68 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01); H01R 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/00 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01H 2085/208 (2013.01); H01R 13/68 (2013.01); H01R 13/7032 (2013.01); H01R 31/06 (2013.01); H01R 2201/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096621 A1 20010502; EP 1096621 B1 20070207; DE 60033255 D1 20070322; DE 60033255 T2 20070524; JP 2001135438 A 20010518

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071108

2007-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60033255 P 20070322

2007-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI