Global Patent Index - EP 1096623 A1

EP 1096623 A1 2001-05-02 - Electrical connector and its manufacturing process

Title (en)

Electrical connector and its manufacturing process

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder und Herstellungsverfahren eines solchen Verbinders

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique et procédé de fabrication d'un tel connecteur

Publication

EP 1096623 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402935 A

Priority

  • FR 9913338 A
  • FR 0000278 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical connection method (1) connects to a feed socket (2). The electrical feed cable (14) connects to the socket. The cable conductors (12) are connected directly and in a non removable way to the conductor strip (4).

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un procédé de fabrication de connecteurs électriques (1) destinés au raccordement d'appareils électriques sans fil, à un circuit d'alimentation, lesquels connecteurs comprennent un socle (2) et au moins une lamelle (4) de contact, reliée électriquement à un câble d'alimentation (14), caractérisé par le fait que l'on relie électriquement directement de manière inamovible au moins un conducteur (12) du câble d'alimentation (14) sur une lamelle (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/20; A47J 27/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/20 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01); H01R 43/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/20 (2013.01); H01R 13/5833 (2013.01); H01R 43/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096623 A1 20010502; FR 2800207 A1 20010427

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080122

2007-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070911

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI