Global Patent Index - EP 1096661 A2

EP 1096661 A2 2001-05-02 - Oscillator phase noise prediction

Title (en)

Oscillator phase noise prediction

Title (de)

Vorhersage des Phasenrauschens eines Oszillators

Title (fr)

Prédiction du bruit de phase d'un oscillateur

Publication

EP 1096661 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308100 A

Priority

US 41101599 A

Abstract (en)

The phase noise of an oscillator described by a known set of differential algebraic equations (DAEs) can be quickly and accurately predicted by a) finding the steady state waveform of the oscillator, e.g., by using harmonic balance techniques or so-called "shooting" techniques, either of which involves developing a mathematical quantity known as the augmented Jacobian matrix; b) solving a prescribed linear system of equations that uses the augmented Jacobian matrix, the solution being called a perturbation projection vector (PPV), c) plotting a graph of the phase noise of the oscillator as a Lorentzian function of the solution of the prescribed linear system of equations. The prescribed linear system of equations which is used is the system of equations formed by setting a matrix product equal to a unit vector. The factors in the matrix product are 1) a form of the augmented Jacobian matrix, e.g., the Hermitian, for use with the harmonic balance technique, or the adjoint, for use with shooting, and 2) the PPV. The variables of the Lorentzian function of the solution of the prescribed linear system of equations includes 1) the frequency at which the phase noise is to be found, 2) a jitter factor determined for the oscillator, and 3) the steady state waveform of the oscillator, which includes the natural frequency of the oscillator. The jitter factor for the oscillator is determined using the PPV. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03B 1/00 (2013.01); H03B 2200/009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096661 A2 20010502; EP 1096661 A3 20030514; US 6529859 B1 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080326

2004-03-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI