Global Patent Index - EP 1096793 A2

EP 1096793 A2 2001-05-02 - System, method, signal, user interface and software to display thumbnail banners

Title (en)

System, method, signal, user interface and software to display thumbnail banners

Title (de)

System, Verfahren, Signal, Benutzerschnittstelle und Software zur Anzeige von Daumennagelbannern

Title (fr)

Système, méthode, signal, interface graphique et logiciel pour afficher de bannières de type ongle du pouce

Publication

EP 1096793 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123070 A

Priority

US 42628399 A

Abstract (en)

A user interface, method, system, signal, and software for displaying information associated with thumbnail images of content from one or more media sources of one or more media types. These thumbnail images may be displayed in a banner, to facilitate finding associated information. Items associated with the thumbnail image can be displayed when the thumbnail is focused or selected in response to user input. The items displayed may include, for example, program information, information returned by an Internet search, or menus presenting options available for the focused or selected thumbnail image's content source. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/45

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06F 3/048 (2006.01); H04N 5/445 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/44591 (2013.01); H04N 21/4104 (2013.01); H04N 21/4143 (2013.01); H04N 21/4312 (2013.01); H04N 21/4316 (2013.01); H04N 21/4438 (2013.01); H04N 21/4622 (2013.01); H04N 21/4722 (2013.01); H04N 21/478 (2013.01); H04N 21/482 (2013.01); H04N 21/4858 (2013.01); H04N 21/4725 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096793 A2 20010502; EP 1096793 A3 20020522; EP 1096793 B1 20040922; DE 60014006 D1 20041028; DE 60014006 T2 20050929; JP 2001203954 A 20010727

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014006 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOGER, ROBERT A.

2003-12-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SMITH, KIM C.

2003-12-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GREENWOOD, JON MICHEL

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 5/45 A, 7H 04N 5/445 B, 7G 06F 3/033 B, 7G 09G 5/14 B, 7G 06F 17/30 B

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPOTWARE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GATEWAY, INC.

2001-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOGER, ROBERT A.

2001-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SMITH, KIM C.

2001-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GREENWOOD, JON MICHEL

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI