Global Patent Index - EP 1096830 A2

EP 1096830 A2 2001-05-02 - High frequency transducer

Title (en)

High frequency transducer

Title (de)

Hochfrequenz-Wandler

Title (fr)

Transducteur acoustique haute fréquence

Publication

EP 1096830 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309554 A

Priority

  • GB 9925674 A
  • US 52191100 A

Abstract (en)

A high frequency transducer 10 having a dome diaphragm 52 with a configuration of a bisected ellipse to overcome the distortion and breaking point of prior art domes even at frequencies above 30kHz. The dome diaphragm having an annular skirt 54 extending therefrom in an integral fashion and connecting to a disc shaped plate 30 of the transducer. A voice coil 60 of cylindrical section is directly connected to the skirt at a region of close proximity to said dome. The dome is constructed of a rigid material such as a metal, an alloy, a metalloid such as, but not limited to, titanium, aluminum, and boron, or a combination thereof. The dome is constructed in accordance with a general formula for an ellipse (x<2>/a<2>)+(y<2>/b<2>)=1, and a>b, wherein a is half of the length of a major axis and b is half of the length of a minor axis of the ellipse. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/02 (2006.01); H04R 7/02 (2006.01); H04R 7/12 (2006.01); H04R 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/127 (2013.01); H04R 2207/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1096830 A2 20010502; EP 1096830 A3 20030502; JP 2001169386 A 20010622

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051219

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031203

2004-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 7/12 A

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 31/00 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI