Global Patent Index - EP 1096854 A2

EP 1096854 A2 2001-05-09 - HERBICIDAL AGENTS CONTAINING ETHOXYSULFURON AND FENTRAZAMIDE

Title (en)

HERBICIDAL AGENTS CONTAINING ETHOXYSULFURON AND FENTRAZAMIDE

Title (de)

HERBIZIDE MITTEL ENTHALTEND ETHOXYSULFURON UND FENTRAZAMID

Title (fr)

HERBICIDES CONTENANT ETHOXYSULFURON ET FENTRAZAMIDE

Publication

EP 1096854 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99936162 A

Priority

  • DE 19832017 A
  • DE 19928453 A
  • EP 9904957 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003592A2] The invention relates to herbicidal agents containing A) one or more herbicidal active agents from the group of substituted phenoxysulfonylureas of formula (I) and their salts and B) one or more herbicidally active compounds from the following group of compounds: Ba) herbicides which are selectively active in rice, predominantly against grasses, chosen from the following group: fentrazamide (NBA 061), haloxyfop, sethoxydim, dithiopyr, etobenzanide clefoxidim, KIH 6127 and clethodim; Bb) herbicides which are selectively active in rice, predominantly against dicotyledonous harmful plants and cyperacaen, chosen from the following group: 2,4-D, MCPA, mecoprop, mecoprop-P, tritosulfuron, halosulfuron-methyl, dicamba, acifluorofen, carfentrazone, bentazone and triclopyr; Bc) herbicides which are selectively active in rice, predominantly against grasses and dicotyledonous harmful plants and cyperacaen, chosen from the following group: pendimethalin, clomazone, KIH 2023, oxadiargyl, cyclosulfamuron (AC 322, 140), azimsulfuron (DPX-A-8947), nicosulfuron, cinmethylin, indanofan, pentoxazone, pyribenzoxim, oxaziclomefone (MY-100), fluthiamide and mesotrione; preferably according to a weight ratio of compounds of formula (I) or their salts (type A compounds) and compounds from group B of 1:20000 to 200:1, preferably 1:8000 to 100:1, especially preferably 1:4000 to 50:1. The inventive herbicidal agents are suitable for use in combating undesirable harmful plants, preferably in rice crops.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 47/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/54 (2006.01); A01N 43/713 (2006.01); A01N 43/76 (2006.01); A01N 43/80 (2006.01); A01N 43/824 (2006.01); A01N 43/86 (2006.01); A01N 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 47/36 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A01N 47/36 + A01N 47/38 + A01N 47/36 + A01N 43/90 + A01N 43/88 + A01N 43/86 + A01N 43/82 + A01N 43/80 + A01N 43/76 + A01N 43/653 + A01N 43/54 + A01N 43/40 + A01N 43/20 + A01N 43/18 + A01N 41/10 + A01N 39/04 + A01N 39/02 + A01N 37/48 + A01N 37/40 + A01N 35/10 + A01N 33/20

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003592A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003592 A2 20000127; WO 0003592 A3 20001109; AR 020602 A1 20020522; AU 5281299 A 20000207; BR 9912823 A 20010502; BR PI9912823 B1 20160126; CN 1318978 A 20011024; CO 5090896 A1 20011030; EP 1096854 A2 20010509; ID 30114 A 20011108; IN 60CH2001 A 20050304; JP 2002520341 A 20020709; KR 20010079532 A 20010822; MX PA01000523 A 20020401; TR 200100099 T2 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-03-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HERBICIDAL AGENTS CONTAINING ETHOXYSULFURON AND FENTRAZAMIDE

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HACKER, ERWIN

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIERINGER, HERMANN

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AULER, THOMAS

2001-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MELENDEZ, ALVARO

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI